Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ghirardi

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1658³Born
20 Mar 172667.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Montemarano, Italy
20 Mar 172667.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
24 Mar 172667.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
9 Jul 172668.1SucceededBishop of Montemarano, Italy
8 Oct 174587.3DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ghirardi
Bishop Giovanni Ghirardi (born , died ) Bishop of Montemarano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCervinara

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142, and Page 274
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017