Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Rambert

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1669³BornChambery
16 Mar 169829.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 169829.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 172758.3SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
26 Nov 172758.7ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
30 Nov 172758.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
16 Sep 172859.5DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Rambert:
Bishop Jacques Rambert (born , died ) Bishop of Aosta

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 105
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015