Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Pietro Faccolli

Deceased

Bishop of Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1669BornLecce
5 Apr 169222.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 169223.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 172656.7AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
29 Sep 172656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
2 Jan 175282.0DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Pietro Faccolli:
Bishop Giovanni Pietro Faccolli (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 392
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015