Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Pucci Franceschi

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1673Born
6 Apr 169724.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 172451.7AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
21 Dec 172451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
20 Sep 172855.5AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
26 Feb 173763.9DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Pucci Franceschi
Bishop Bartolomeo Pucci Franceschi (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131, and Page 315
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1724, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018