Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Renato Massa

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini

Titular Archbishop of Sebastea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1691BornNapoli
4 Aug 171523.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 172635.1AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
5 Jan 172735.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Apr 174149.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebastea
13 Jun 174452.6DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Massa:
Archbishop Renato Massa (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 99
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013