Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicoḷ Givovich

Deceased

Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1693BornSabiuncellae
29 Sep 171724.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 174955.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
5 May 174955.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
29 Jun 174955.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
13 Nov 175259.3SucceededBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
16 May 176268.8DiedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Nicoḷ Givovich:
Bishop Nicoḷ Givovich (born , died ) Bishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium)

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 83, and Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 Sep 2014