Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Gentile, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹BornGenova
13 Sep 169436.6AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
19 Sep 169436.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
2 Sep 169537.6DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Gentile:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Gentile O.S.B. (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015