Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cutillo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1626³BornMontis Fuscolo
13 Sep 169468.1AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
19 Sep 169468.1Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
Dec 1704³78.3DiedBishop of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cutillo:
Bishop Carlo Cutillo O.S.B. (born , died Dec 1704) Bishop of Minori

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 270
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015