Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Compagni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1640BornRoma
2 Jan 169655.3AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
29 Jan 169655.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
25 Jun 170362.8AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
17 Sep 170565.0DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Compagni:
Bishop Gregorio Compagni O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131, and Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015