Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Manuel de Mejía

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638²BornCórdoba
5 Oct 169355.7AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
25 Oct 169355.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
15 Jan 170365.0AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Sep 170466.7DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Manuel de Mejía:
Archbishop Fernando Manuel de Mejía (born 1638, died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 422
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 235, Number 1,461
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 28 Apr 2015