Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alfonso ValeriÓ y Aloza, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of LÚrida, Spain

Note/Previous Titular See: (Gaspar de Santa MarÝa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643²Born
8 Feb 169451.1AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
14 Feb 169451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
1 Jun 169956.4AppointedBishop of LÚrida, Spain
15 Dec 170057.9DiedBishop of LÚrida, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alfonso ValeriÓ y Aloza
Bishop Juan Alfonso ValeriÓ y Aloza O.F.M. Disc. (born 1643, died ) Bishop of LÚrida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerriente

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153, and Page 227
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 236, Number 1,464
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1694, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018