Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Llinás y Aznar, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornBroto
11 Oct 169460.7AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
6 Mar 169561.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
15 Nov 171076.8DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Llinás y Aznar:
Archbishop José Llinás y Aznar O. de M. (born 1634, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 237, Number 1,470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015