Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benito Cardinal de Sala y de Caramany, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1646BornGerona
24 Nov 169852.6AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
15 Mar 169952.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
18 May 171266.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Jan 171366.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jul 171569.2DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito de Sala y de Caramany:
Cardinal Benito de Sala y de Caramany O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,096
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 240, Number 1,489

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013