Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Dorda, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1661³BornMataró
16 Jun 168524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
11 Sep 170847.3SelectedBishop of Solsona, Spain
19 Feb 171048.7ConfirmedBishop of Solsona, Spain
30 Mar 171048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
3 Dec 171655.5DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Dorda:
Bishop Francisco Dorda O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,061
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,875
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 65
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015