Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Senjust y de Pagés

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1648³BornBarcelona
24 Sep 167224.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 170758.8SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
19 Feb 171061.4ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
30 Mar 171061.5Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
18 Jun 172071.7DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Senjust y de Pagés:
Bishop Manuel Senjust y de Pagés (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,876
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 28, Number 66
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015