Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pascual

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644BornArenys
29 Aug 168440.7SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
15 Jan 168541.0ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
25 Jul 170460.6DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pascual:
Bishop Antonio Pascual (died ) Bishop of Vic

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 413
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,152
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 226, Number 1,404

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014