Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Pontich, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1632Born
10 Dec 165422.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 168653.4AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
25 Jul 168653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
26 Jan 169966.1DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Pontich
Bishop Miguel Pontich O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBouleternere, France

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 227, Number 1,414
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast