Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Desbach i Martorell

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1617BornPollensa
16 Feb 168264.9AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
4 Oct 168265.5Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
16 Aug 168871.4DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Desbach i Martorell:
Bishop Juan Bautista Desbach i Martorell (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 399
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,093
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 223, Number 1,380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013