Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Sanchís y Ferrandis (Jerez), O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1622BornValencia
22 Feb 167249.2AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
12 Jun 167249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
13 Oct 167249.8SelectedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
17 Jul 167350.6ConfirmedBishop of Segorbe, Spain
27 Nov 167956.9AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
26 Mar 169471.3DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Sanchís y Ferrandis (Jerez):
Archbishop José Sanchís y Ferrandis (Jerez) O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 82, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 208, Number 1,300

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013