Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Alfonso de Los Cameros

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1654AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
25 Jan 1654Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
24 Jul 1656SelectedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
16 Oct 1656ConfirmedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
14 May 1668AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
19 Aug 1668InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
26 Jul 1676DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfonso de Los Cameros:
Archbishop Luis Alfonso de Los Cameros (died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 249
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 183, Number 1,143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013