Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Cardinal Spada

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1594BornBrisighella, Italy
1623²28.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 162329.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
4 Dec 162329.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
8 Dec 162329.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
19 Jan 162631.7Elevated to Cardinal
1627²32.6AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
9 Aug 162733.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
22 May 164248.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
19 Feb 164651.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
29 Apr 165258.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
23 Sep 165258.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
11 Oct 165561.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
10 Nov 166167.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Spada:
Bernardino Cardinal Spada (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
  • a cardinal for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 19, and Page 172
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 483
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015