Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Pauli

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
23 Feb 164361.1AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
22 Mar 164361.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
23 Jul 164563.5DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Pauli
Bishop Alessandro Pauli (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnagni
Ordained BishopGes¨, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 367
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1643, Number 9
  • c34: AT, 10 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018