Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Smith

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of England (and Wales), Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1568³Born
7 May 159223.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 162456.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain
29 Nov 162456.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
12 Jan 162556.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcedon
1632²63.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of England (and Wales), Great Britain
18 Mar 165586.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of England (and Wales), Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Smith (VIAF: 73877963)
Bishop Richard Smith (born Nov 1568, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of England (and Wales)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHanworth, Lincoln, Lincolnshire
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceFosse Saint Victor, Paris, Diocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 147
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 184, and Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 1
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast