Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René du Louët de Coetjunval

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1584BornCastro de Kancoat
1610¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 164056.1SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
1 Dec 164258.1ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
1 Feb 164358.2Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
11 Feb 166883.3DiedBishop of Quimper, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René du Louët de Coetjunval:
Bishop René du Louët de Coetjunval (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015