Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Armand-Jean Cardinal du Plessis de Richelieu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1585BornParis
160519.3SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
18 Dec 160621.3ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
17 Apr 160721.6Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
5 Sep 162237.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Apr 162438.6ResignedBishop of Luçon, France
4 Dec 164257.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Armand-Jean du Plessis de Richelieu:
Cardinal Armand-Jean du Plessis de Richelieu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
  • a cardinal for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013