Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Louis Chasteigner de La Rocheposay

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1577Born
19 Mar 161234.5AppointedBishop of Poitiers, France
13 May 161234.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
30 Jul 165173.8DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Louis Chasteigner de La Rocheposay
Bishop Henri Louis Chasteigner de La Rocheposay (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTivoli, Diocese of Tivoli, Italy

  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,612, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast