Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel de L’Aubespine

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1579Born
15 Mar 160425.1AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
28 Mar 160425.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
15 Aug 1630³51.5DiedBishop of Orléans, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel de L’Aubespine
Bishop Gabriel de L’Aubespine (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 40, Number 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018