Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Cospéan

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1571BornMons, Belgium
4 Dec 160635.8AppointedBishop of Aire, France
18 Feb 160736.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
13 Oct 162150.6AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
28 Jan 163664.9AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
8 May 164675.2DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Cospéan:
Bishop Philippe Cospéan (born , died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69, and Page 220
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 4 Mar 2015