Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Raoul de La Guibourgère

Deceased

Bishop of La Rochelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornNantes
23 Jan 163142.0SelectedBishop of Saintes, France
7 Jul 163142.5ConfirmedBishop of Saintes, France
11 Jan 163243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saintes, France
4 May 164859.3AppointedBishop of La Rochelle, France
15 May 166172.3DiedBishop of La Rochelle, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Raoul de La Guibourgère:
Bishop Jacques Raoul de La Guibourgère (died ) Bishop of La Rochelle

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 304, and Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015