Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Ghislieri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1649AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
7 Feb 1649Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
1 Sep 1664AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
4 Jul 1672ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Ghislieri (VIAF: 309710077)
Bishop Francesco Maria Ghislieri , Bishop Emeritus of Imola

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 209, and Page 331
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 22
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,024

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016