Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Niccolo Pietro Bargellini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
4 Jul 166535.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
6 Jul 166535.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
2 Aug 166535.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
11 Feb 166838.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
8 Mar 166838.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
Jul 1671³41.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
8 May 169060.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 Sep 169464.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccolo Pietro Bargellini (VIAF: 304920219)
Patriarch Niccolo Pietro Bargellini (born 1630, died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1665, Number 18
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016