Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino de Rossi, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jun 1634AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
30 Jul 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
13 Aug 1640AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
1653²DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costantino de Rossi:
Bishop Costantino de Rossi C.R.S. , Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 145, and Page 361
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 94, Number 563
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015