Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Candiotti

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
18 Aug 165348.6AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
7 Sep 165348.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
21 Jan 168075.0DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Candiotti
Bishop Vincenzo Candiotti (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Angelo in Vado
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro in Monte Cavallo, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 25
  • ob/c2: AT, 15 Oct 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast