Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Frescobaldi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1654AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
28 Oct 1654Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
11 Dec 1654DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Frescobaldi:
Bishop Pietro Frescobaldi (died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 117, Number 714
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013