Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mastelloni

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1654AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
28 Oct 1654Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
28 Jul 1668DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mastelloni
Bishop Giovanni Mastelloni (died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 117, Number 714
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018