Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume Du Nozet

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Mar 1621AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
12 Apr 1621Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
20 Nov 1626DiedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Du Nozet:
Archbishop Guillaume Du Nozet (died ) Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 71, Number 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015