Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Sacrati

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567²Born
5 Nov 161245.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
31 Dec 161245.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
19 Apr 162154.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 162154.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
23 May 162255.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena, Italy
6 Sep 162356.6DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Francesco Sacrati
Francesco Cardinal Sacrati
(born 1567, died )
Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1621
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172, and Page 127
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 54, Number 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025