Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneo (Francesco) Brasavola, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
17 Dec 157816.9ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
1584²22.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
9 Jan 161755.0AppointedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
15 Jan 161755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy
23 Mar 162159.2DiedBishop of Castro [del Lazio], Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ireneo (Francesco) Brasavola (VIAF: 164941860)
Bishop Ireneo (Francesco) Brasavola O.F.M. Obs. (born 1562, died ) Bishop of Castro [del Lazio]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCastro, Diocese of Castro [del Lazio]
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Castro, Diocese of Castro [del Lazio]

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 140
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,055

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast