Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonifazio Cardinal Bevilacqua Aldobrandini

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1571BornFerrara
3 Apr 159827.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
3 Mar 159928.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 159928.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
26 Feb 160130.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
10 Sep 160130.7AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
31 Aug 161140.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
7 Jan 161342.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
29 Mar 162150.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
27 Sep 162352.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
7 Sep 162655.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
7 Apr 162756.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

MicroData Summary for Bonifazio Bevilacqua Aldobrandini:
Cardinal Bonifazio Bevilacqua Aldobrandini (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 28.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 Mar 1599
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 162, and Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013