Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano De Paoli

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornNepi
23 May 162231.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
23 May 162231.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
5 Jun 162231.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
Sep 1627³36.7SucceededBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
17 Feb 164352.1DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano De Paoli:
Bishop Sebastiano De Paoli (died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 255, and Page 257
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 76, Number 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013