Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joannes Mattaeus Caryophyllis

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹BornLa Canee
8 Aug 162256.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
18 Sep 162256.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
23 May 163367.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Iconium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Mattaeus Caryophyllis:
Archbishop Joannes Mattaeus Caryophyllis (died ) Titular Archbishop of Iconium

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 77, Number 454
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015