Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Agucchia

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Amasea

Apostolic Nuncio to Venice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornBologne
23 Oct 162353.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
19 Nov 162353.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
16 Dec 162353.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1 Jan 163262.0DiedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Agucchia (VIAF: 20618648)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Agucchia (born 1570, died ) Titular Archbishop of Amasea

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 81, Number 478
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 34
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 Sep 2016