Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop García Gil Manrique

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1618AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Spain
5 Mar 1618AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
29 Apr 1618Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
30 Aug 1627AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
28 Nov 1633AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
1655¹DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for García Gil Manrique:
Bishop García Gil Manrique , Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 64, Number 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 355, and Page 194
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 136, Number 870
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015