Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Borja

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586²BornBerlanga
26 Jul 162539.5SelectedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
15 Sep 162539.7ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
4 Jan 162640.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca, Spain
11 Jul 163044.5DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Borja:
Bishop Baltasar Borja (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 228
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 148, Number 939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015