Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Sentmenat y Lanuza

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1639SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
20 Jan 1640ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
Jun 1640³Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
25 Oct 1655AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
11 Feb 1663DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Sentmenat y Lanuza:
Bishop Ramón Sentmenat y Lanuza (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110, and Page 367
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 169, Number 1,059
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015