Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Roger, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Solsona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599¹BornBarcelona
18 Sep 165657.7AppointedBishop of Solsona, Spain
7 Mar 165758.2Ordained BishopBishop of Solsona, Spain
18 Jan 166364.0DiedBishop of Solsona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Roger:
Bishop Francisco Roger O.P. (died ) Bishop of Solsona

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,030
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013