Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Cardona

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornGerona
24 Jul 165664.5AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Dec 165664.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
13 Dec 165866.9DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Cardona:
Bishop Bernardo Cardona (died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,029
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015