Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso de Sotomayor, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornCarmona, Spain
1652²44.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
24 Sep 165749.7AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
3 Nov 165850.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
9 Jun 166456.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Barcelona, Spain
10 Jun 168274.4DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Sotomayor:
Archbishop Alfonso de Sotomayor O. de M. (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91, and Page 110
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,031
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 189, Number 1,184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015