Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Crespín de Valldaura i Brizuela, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1601BornSan Mateo
24 Jan 165452.3SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
25 Nov 165554.2ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
17 Dec 165655.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
30 May 166260.7DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francisco Crespín de Valldaura i Brizuela:
Bishop Francisco Crespín de Valldaura i Brizuela O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 186, Number 1,164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013