Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Parcero de Castro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1566BornTuy
11 Apr 163064.1SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Aug 163064.4ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
1631²64.8Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
19 Dec 163367.8AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
29 Nov 165589.7AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
17 Dec 166397.8DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Parcero de Castro:
Bishop Gregorio Parcero de Castro O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 33.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 182, and Page 194
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013